HARVINDER PAL SINGH GILL
-
About HARVINDER PAL SINGH GILL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201RJ2006PTC023208 AARON LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 473000.0 Active 10/10/2006 - U51101RJ1978PTC001828 PADMINI ENTERPRISES PVT LTD 150000.0 Active 30/01/2016 - U74140RJ2012PTC039866 FORTE FOLIAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - U92132RJ2006PTC022640 VINAYAKA TELEVISION NETWORK PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 03/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
BHAG CHAND BARDIYA Director RAJESH SHARMA Director RAGHUNATH SINGH Director BRIJ RAJ SINGH Director