HARI KIRAN VALLURIPALLI
-
About HARI KIRAN VALLURIPALLI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15421MH2000PLC130397 JAY MAHESH SUGAR INDUSTRIES LIMITED 298370000.0 Amalgamated 25/06/2011 - U45200TG2007PTC052250 TRIVIKRAM CONSTRUCTIONS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 120100000.0 Active 23/04/2007 - U70102TG2011PTC072414 HARIPRIYA CONVENTION CENTER PRIVATE LIMITED 6797000.0 Active 28/01/2011 - U72200TG1995PTC022599 B-IQ TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 7364000.0 Active 28/12/2000 - U74900TG2012PTC081143 VINCIEN ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/05/2012 - U74999TG2007NPL085655 CEO CLUBS INDIA 100000.0 Active 05/10/2007 - U74999TG2016PTC109268 VMR ARTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/04/2016 - U85110DL2005PTC141431 INTERNATIONAL ONCOLOGY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 104033690.0 Active 04/07/2012 - -
Associated with Directors