HARCHARAN SINGH NAG
-
About HARCHARAN SINGH NAG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15510DL1985PLC022506 UNI MILK SPECIALITIES LIMITED 500000.0 Dormant under section 455 20/07/1988 - U74899DL1980PTC010116 H S NAG AND ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED 2160000.0 Active 04/01/1980 - U74899DL1983PTC016868 NAG CONSTRUCTORS PVT LTD 500000.0 Under Liquidation 29/10/1983 - U74899DL1986PTC024923 NAG INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 314300.0 Active 24/07/1986 - U74899DL1987PTC028711 UTILITY TECHNO LINKS PRIVATE LTD 153000.0 Dormant under section 455 16/10/1989 - -
Associated with Directors
SUSHIL JAIN Director GURPREET SINGH NAG Director AMRIK NAG SINGH Director