HITENDRA TOMAR
-
About HITENDRA TOMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400DL2009PTC195836 AMY CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/03/2011 - U70100DL2010PTC208479 AGC PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2015 - U70101DL2010PTC208455 AGC LANDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/11/2014 - U70102DL2011PTC214738 DKM DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2013 - U70109DL2006PTC155463 LEELA INFRASTRUCTURE & MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2011 - U72900DL2010PTC204516 LEELAJAY TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJ KUMAR Director AJAY CHAUDHRY Director UMA SHANKAR Director OMENDER KUMAR Director