INDU RANI PUNJ
-
About INDU RANI PUNJ,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01122MP1990PTC005932 JAY AGROFLORA PVT LTD 140000.0 Active 10/12/1990 - U70101DL1990PTC039609 PUNJ SONS PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 06/04/1990 - U74899DL1981PTC011818 SAGIT INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 300000.0 Amalgamated 23/04/1991 - U74899DL1981PTC011820 SHUBHVIR INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 1000000.0 Active 14/09/1992 - U74899DL1981PTC012086 SANAT INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 07/10/2013 - U74899DL1984PTC017736 ATNA ENGINEERING PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 07/10/2013 - U74899DL1984PTC018100 DEV AUTOMOBILES PVT.LTD. 100000.0 Active 13/08/2007 - U74899DL1985PTC022422 D AND A FOODS PRIVATE LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 23/04/1991 - U74899DL1989PTC035395 INDTECH INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 27/11/1989 - U74899DL1994PTC062259 VANSH IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 2302400.0 Active 16/12/1994 - U74899DL1995PTC064809 VISHVDEVA BUILDERS AND PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1020200.0 Active 13/08/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
SATYA NARAIN PRAKASH PUNJ Director JYOTI PUNJ Director ARTI JAIDEV INDRA SINGH Director