ISHWAR CHAND JINDAL
-
About ISHWAR CHAND JINDAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27102CT2002PTC015388 N.R.SPONGE PRIVATE LIMITED 21413190.0 Active 21/01/2007 - U27109DL1991PLC042681 MAGNUM STEELS LIMITED 24500000.0 Active 03/07/2000 - U27320DL1996PLC083227 MAGNUM STEEL AND POWER LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 12/11/1996 - U31500DL2009PLC187973 URJA BATTERIES LIMITED 39450000.0 Active 27/09/2017 - U40101DL2010PTC206145 MAGNUM POWER AND INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1886000.0 Active 21/07/2010 - U67120DL2000PTC104204 TRIPLE S STOCK AND SHARES PRIVATE LIMITED 222000.0 Active 15/02/2012 - U74899DL1987PTC026784 B.R.ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED 3430000.0 Active 27/01/1987 - U74899DL1990PTC038995 I.R.S. INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 20/09/1997 - U74899DL1990PTC040072 DELUXE ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 01/03/1993 - U74899DL1991PTC045474 MAGNUM IRON AND STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 4831000.0 Active 25/09/2001 - U74899DL1995PTC069166 COURAGE FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 4491020.0 Active 01/10/2006 -