INDRAN BRAR
-
About INDRAN BRAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24232PB1984PTC005717 CHETAK PHARMACEUTICALS PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 22/11/1999 - U24233DL2007PTC169417 DAVIX PHARMACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2007 - U74140DL2004PTC124406 DAVIX MANAGAEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/03/2004 - U74899DL1989PTC036489 GREEN VALLY LAND AND DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 11000000.0 Active 18/12/1997 - U74899DL1991PTC046085 SURAJ HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 9475000.0 Active 28/04/1994 - U74899DL1991PTC046086 SURAJ OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 3250000.0 Active 18/12/1997 - -
Associated with Directors
ANANDBIR SINGH BRAR Director DAVINDER SINGH BRAR Director