ISHWAR SINGH
-
About ISHWAR SINGH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70100HR2011PTC042310 KIRPALU BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70100HR2011PTC042314 HANSVAHINI BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70100HR2011PTC042316 DURGA MATA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70100HR2011PTC042325 GYANESHWARI BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70101HR2011PTC042272 GHANSHYAM LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70101HR2011PTC042273 JAIVARDHAN LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70101HR2011PTC042341 BRIJESH LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70101HR2011PTC042343 CHAKRADEV LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70101HR2011PTC042356 DHRUPAD BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70104HR2011PTC042313 ANJANI SUNU BUILDMART PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 10/02/2016 U70109PB2011PTC034718 HARE RAMA LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2011 10/02/2016 U70109PB2011PTC034727 RADHE KRISHNA BUILDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2011 10/02/2016 U70109PB2011PTC034729 BRAMHA BUILDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2011 10/02/2016 U70109PB2011PTC034734 AARTI LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/02/2011 10/02/2016 U70109PB2011PTC034736 NARAINA LANDPRO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/02/2011 10/02/2016 -
Associated with Directors
RAMESH JUYAL Director VIKRAM VERMA Director ANIL KUMAR Director BHARAT SINGH Director