JAYANTA KUMAR SAHA
-
About JAYANTA KUMAR SAHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01112CH1992PLC011970 HIMALAYAN AYURVEDIC AND AGRO RESEARCH CENTRE LTD 3730700.0 Active 28/03/2016 - U17100PB2010PLC033590 BHARAT TOWELS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 09/02/2010 - U17121PB2008PTC032283 CRYSTAL YARNS PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Amalgamated 06/01/2010 - U17301PB2010PLC033589 GREEN GLOBE TEXTILES LIMITED 500000000.0 Active 30/07/2010 - U45209PB2014PTC038692 LOTUS ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 47600000.0 Active 23/06/2014 - U51909PB2010PLC033584 TRUE VALUE TRADERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 09/02/2010 - U72900PB2014PTC038719 LOTUS CORPORATE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/07/2014 - U74920PB2011PTC034973 LOTUS BUSINESS & VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/06/2014 - -
Associated with Directors