JUGAL CHANDRAKANT THACKER
-
About JUGAL CHANDRAKANT THACKER,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51311MH2007PLC175688 COMFORT COMMOTRADE LIMITED 100200000.0 Active 02/08/2014 - L65923WB1982PLC035441 COMFORT FINCAP LIMITED 108513000.0 Active 02/08/2014 - U15313MP2012PTC029755 SRBH FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 8100000.0 Active 23/11/2015 - U45202MP2006PTC027091 SRBH ENGINEERING & EQUIPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 29/08/2006 - U50100MP2007PTC029592 R.M. SALES & SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/12/2013 - U51109MP1995PTC033844 TOPGRAIN MANAGEMENT PVT LTD 8952000.0 Active 21/08/2006 - U51420MP2004PTC033843 DESATAN IRON & STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 30/07/2008 - U63090MP2014PTC032919 RSD TRANS CONNECT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/09/2016 - U67120MH2002PLC136562 COMFORT SECURITIES LIMITED 117500000.0 Active 08/08/2007 - U67120MH2008PTC184465 SHIELD REALTY AND CAPITAL PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 28/05/2015 - U74999MH2016PTC284349 XCLLENCE EDUVENTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/08/2016 - U99999TG1975PLC001837 LIQUORS INDIA LTD 87579000.0 Active 14/02/2013 - -
Associated with Directors