JYOTSNA PODDAR
-
About JYOTSNA PODDAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51226WB1985PLC039055 ADVENTZ INVESTMENTS AND HOLDINGS LIMITED 54633240.0 Amalgamated 26/06/1997 - L51909WB1982PLC035358 RONSON TRADERS LTD 5730000.0 Active 05/02/1993 - L65921GA1967PLC000157 ZUARI GLOBAL LIMITED 294406040.0 Active 15/05/2009 - L70101WB1939PLC009800 TEXMACO INFRASTRUCTURE & HOLDINGS LIMITED 127426590.0 Active 20/03/2015 - U01132WB1954PLC021767 NILGIRI PLANTATIONS LTD 4500000.0 Active 31/01/1979 - U01132WB1993PLC060495 SYNDAK TEA TECH LTD 500000.0 Active 09/02/1998 - U51109WB1924PLC004829 LIONEL EDWARDS LTD 9800000.0 Active 01/01/1987 - U52110WB1997PLC083860 LIONEL INDIA LIMITED 105090000.0 Active 03/04/1997 - U67120WB1986PTC040276 ABHISHEK HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 291000.0 Active 10/01/2001 - U67120WB1987PLC042858 SANGHA SHREE INVESTMENTS & TRADING COMPANY LIMITED 5226730.0 Active 27/12/1990 - U67120WB1987PLC043223 YASHOVARDHAN INVESTMENT & TRADING COMPANY LIMITED 48440280.0 Active 04/08/1994 - U74900WB2015PTC204931 ADVENTZ HOMECARE PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 13/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors