JATINDER KAUR
-
About JATINDER KAUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201UP1996PTC019296 LOTUS COLONIZERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1330700.0 Active 06/04/2015 - U45201UP1996PTC019297 G.B. PROPERTIES PVT.LTD. 1330700.0 Active 06/04/2015 - U51909DL2006PTC145371 G.S.C. ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/10/2015 - U51909DL2006PTC145379 R.S.C. ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/04/2015 - U70100DL1991PTC043010 SUDHA GROWTH FUND PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/07/2015 - U70109DL1991PTC043011 AKHIL GROWTH FUND PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/08/2017 - U74899DL1981PTC012099 HIGH RISE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 06/04/2015 - U74899DL1995PTC065746 RADO ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 19999000.0 Active 13/04/2015 - U74899DL1995PTC067031 MOD HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 03/01/1997 - U74999DL2014PTC263591 JKC HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/01/2014 - U80904DL2009NPL193209 WAVECARE FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 18/08/2017 - U85310DL2017PTC318444 INTELLIGENT AGEING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
DEENITA CHADHA Director JASDEEP KAUR CHADHA Director SANAMDEEP CHADHA Director LALIT KAPOOR Director