JAGDISH PRASAD AGRAWAL
-
About JAGDISH PRASAD AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100CT2008PLC020859 YAMUNA STEELS LIMITED 500000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 09/09/2008 - U27100CT2008PLC020862 NARMADA FERRO ALLOYS LIMITED 500000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 09/09/2008 - U27101GA1997PTC002350 ALOK ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 456400.0 Active 30/05/1997 - U31102CT2004PLC017093 SAGAR ENERGY AND STEELS LIMITED 11730000.0 Active 16/12/2004 - U40100CT2008PLC020818 JAGDAMBA VIDYUT LIMITED 500000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 23/08/2008 - U40100CT2008PLC020819 JAGDAMBA URJA LIMITED 500000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 23/08/2008 - U40108CT2008PLC020817 JAGDAMBA TRANSMISSION AND POWER LIMITED 500000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 23/08/2008 - U45201CT2004PTC017094 NISHA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 01/04/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
ALOK KUMAR AGRAWAL Director AMIT AGRAWAL Director Narayan Prasad Agrawal Director NISHA AGRAWAL Director