JAI PRAKASH AGARWAL
-
About JAI PRAKASH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101DL2005PTC136254 ELITE CREATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 339400.0 Active 16/05/2005 - U24232DL2007PTC165600 HERBAL BIOSCIENCES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2007 - U45201DL2005PTC140609 SUPERFLY BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 227100.0 Active 30/03/2012 - U45201DL2005PTC140612 SUN VALLEY TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 17104000.0 Active 20/10/2005 - U45201DL2005PTC143998 MOONLITE HOME DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 124000.0 Active 22/12/2005 - U45201DL2005PTC144002 RPA PROMOTER AND BUILDER PRIVATE LIMITED 3468000.0 Amalgamated 22/12/2005 - U45201DL2005PTC144015 EVERBRIGHT INFRA-DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 464450.0 Active 01/04/2006 - U45201DL2006PTC145878 TRINITY LAND BASE PRIVATE LIMITED 822000.0 Amalgamated 03/02/2006 - U45201UP2005PTC029880 VINAYAK SHREE REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 106500000.0 Active 28/11/2006 - U45206DL2008PTC179343 KEDIA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 3277500.0 Active 01/03/2010 - U45400DL2007PTC165248 YUVRAJ INFRAPROJECT PRIVATE LIMITED 391420.0 Amalgamated 27/06/2007 - U45400DL2007PTC165251 YUVRAJ DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 27/06/2007 - U51109DL1995PLC068537 SIR BIO TECH INDIA LIMITED 38396785.0 Active 21/10/2006 - U51109WB1995PLC074845 CELESTE MERCHANDISE LTD 35000000.0 Active 15/11/2007 - U70101DL2005PTC141979 SUNSHINE REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 447940.0 Active 20/10/2005 - U74899DL1994PTC061224 RAGHUNATH HOLDINGS AND FINLEASE PRIVATE LIMITED 60529800.0 Active 28/03/2007 - U74899DL2005PTC144001 JAI LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 22/12/2005 - U74899DL2006PTC144688 GOODLOOK INFRA- PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/01/2006 - U74999GA2010PTC006347 DAMODAR INFRASTRUCTURE (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 343600.0 Active 12/04/2010 - U85110UP1990PTC012217 MALBROS PHARMACEUTICALS PVT LTD 1467000.0 Active 28/03/2005 - U92141DL2005PTC138050 TRENDY BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 248000.0 Active 30/03/2012 - -
Associated with Directors