JAGDISH SARDA
-
About JAGDISH SARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01111WB2008PTC121489 SK BIOLABS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/01/2008 - U17232WB1989NPL047311 INDIAN JUTE MILLS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 28/09/2015 - U45400WB2005PLC105345 BENGAL INFRABUILDER LIMITED 9957000.0 Active 19/07/2012 - U45400WB2011PTC168328 GOLDSMITH INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 16/02/2012 - U51101WB1986PTC041261 JAGRATI TRADE SERVICES PVT LTD 20015000.0 Active 06/03/2017 - U70101WB2004PTC099097 ESKAY TOWER PRIVATE LIMITED 1346750.0 Active 17/12/2007 - U70200MH2006PTC166320 ASCOT REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 361000000.0 Active 24/09/2009 - U72200WB2006PTC107300 VISION COMPONENTS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 20/05/2006 - -
Associated with Directors