JAY AMBRISH HARIVALLABHDAS
-
About JAY AMBRISH HARIVALLABHDAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100GJ1987PTC009995 AJA METALS AND TUBES PRIVATE LIMITED 125000.0 Active 31/12/1998 - U51909GJ1940PTC000337 ESSENAR INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1462500.0 Active 03/05/2010 - U51909GJ1987PTC009981 AKJAY MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 125100.0 Active 31/12/1998 - U65910GJ1982PTC005560 SHRI AMODYA INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/02/2003 - U65910GJ1984PTC006887 ARDENT INVESTMENT PVT LTD 10000.0 Active 28/09/2004 - U74999GJ2013PTC074906 AKJAY ENVIRO SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 214230.0 Under Process of Striking Off 07/05/2013 -