JANAKI KIRLOSKAR
-
About JANAKI KIRLOSKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01111KA1972PTC002150 VIJAY FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 6244330.0 Active 24/09/1999 - U31909KA1997PTC021648 RAVINDU MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 43333670.0 Active 31/01/2001 - U65910KA1989PTC010160 SRI VIJAYADURGA INVESTMENTS AND AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2472000.0 Active 22/12/2000 - U65992KA1993PTC014848 VIJAYAJYOTHI INVESTMENTSANDAGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 4589270.0 Active 21/12/2000 - U67120KA1990PTC011319 VIJAY KIRTI INVESTMENTS AND AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 5226890.0 Active 21/12/2000 - U85110KA1992PTC012836 ABHIMAN TRADING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 3835770.0 Active 22/12/2000 - -
Associated with Directors
MOHIB NOMANBHAI KHERICHA Director MEENA KIRLOSKAR Director RUKMINI KIRLOSKAR Director