JAI SHANKER VERMA
-
About JAI SHANKER VERMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200UP2007PTC032970 J.S.V MOTORS AND CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 34700000.0 Active 11/06/2010 - U45201UP2005PTC030200 OMSAI NATH BUILDCON (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 21/06/2005 - U45400UP2007PTC033441 PRIYANSHI NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/08/2009 - U45400UP2012PTC049921 JATIN INFRABUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/04/2012 - U45400UP2012PTC051454 JATIN INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/07/2012 - U50102UP2009PTC037564 J.S.V MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/06/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
PANKAJ VERMA Director JATIN VERMA Director RAM SHANKER VERMA Director