JAYSHREE ASHWINKUMAR VYAS
-
About JAYSHREE ASHWINKUMAR VYAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201GJ2008PLC053627 SEWA NIRMAN CONSTRUCTION WORKERS COMPANY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/04/2008 - U51909GJ2003NPL042331 SEWA TRADE FACILITATION CENTRE 29991800.0 Active 31/03/2004 - U65923DL2011PLC222491 SEWA GRIH RIN LIMITED 322112470.0 Active 18/07/2011 - U65993GJ2009PTC056691 ANANYA FINANCE FOR INCLUSIVE GROWTH PRIVATE LIMITED 755100100.0 Active 30/05/2017 - U91990RJ2007NPL024871 RAJASTHAN SHRAM SARATHI ASSOCIATION 100000.0 Active 03/07/2015 - -
Associated with Directors