JAI PRAKASH AGARWALA
-
About JAI PRAKASH AGARWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L40109WB1928PLC023311 THE SHAHJAHANPUR ELECTRIC SUPPLY CO.LTD. 4548000.0 Active 15/01/2015 - U17232WB1942PLC011030 ARICHA TRADING CO LTD 4000000.0 Active 12/05/1995 - U24249WB1988PTC045567 SHREE MAHAVIR DETERGENT PVT. LTD. 1000000.0 Active 16/11/1988 - U26944WB1974PLC029452 HERCULES CHEMICALS & CARBIDE LTD 1000000.0 Active 17/03/2008 - U51101RJ1941PLC000075 BIKANER TRADING CO LTD 900000.0 Active 29/09/2010 - U51109WB1986PTC041082 TRISHAKTI COMMERCIAL PVT LTD 123000.0 Active 08/08/1986 - U51909WB1933PLC007813 W H HARTON & CO LTD 500000.0 Active 20/05/1988 - U67120WB1974PTC029334 ANCHOR INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 6572500.0 Active 30/07/2001 - U67120WB1981PTC033586 ARMSTRONG INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 10100000.0 Active 01/12/2003 - U67120WB1984PTC037489 HOPE MERCANTILES PVT LTD 104000.0 Active 11/05/1984 - U67120WB1984PTC037703 SUPERB MERCANTILES PVT LTD 195000.0 Active 17/05/1988 - U67120WB1984PTC037733 TRITON MERCANTILES PVT LTD 406000.0 Active 16/09/1986 - U67120WB1986PTC040466 KRISHNA MERCANTILES PVT LTD 105000.0 Active 04/04/1986 - U67120WB1986PTC040467 LAV KUSH COMMERCIAL PVT LTD 455000.0 Active 15/04/2008 - U70101WB1935PTC008259 HOWRAH TRADING CO PVT. LTD 6650000.0 Active in Progress 27/02/2012 - -
Associated with Directors