JITENDRA PRASAD SHUKLA
-
About JITENDRA PRASAD SHUKLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122WB2007PLC121050 ROCK SPRING BREWERIES & DISTILLERIES LIMITED 840000.0 Active 13/12/2007 - U45201WB2005PTC106641 AKS TOWERS PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 10/07/2011 - U70101WB1989PTC047290 TRIMURTI COMPLEX PVT. LTD. 650000.0 Active 25/07/1989 - U70101WB1996PTC078431 TARANG BUILDERS PVT LTD 2010000.0 Active 26/03/1996 - -
Associated with Directors
MANJULA SHUKLA Director SWETA SHUKLA Director SHASHI KANT MISHRA Director