JAICHAND LAL DAGA
-
About JAICHAND LAL DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25190KA2014PTC073207 PRIME PIPES & FITTINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 24/01/2014 - U45202KA2013PTC072468 DAGA HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/12/2013 - U85110KA1982PLC004808 PRIME TELE EXTRUSIONS LIMITED 9237000.0 Active 18/10/2000 - U85110KA1987PLC008244 DFCL INDIA LIMITED 13288200.0 Active 18/03/1987 - U85110KA1988PTC009010 RISHI POLY MACH PRIVATE LIMITED 7415000.0 Active 08/10/2004 - U85110KA1994PLC016542 DHANASHREE SECURITIES ANDINVESTMENT COMPANY LIMITED 16436780.0 Active 14/11/1994 - -
Associated with Directors
VIKAS KUMAR DAGA Director MUKESH KUMAR DAGA Director RAKESH KUMAR DAGA Director DHIRAJ KUMAR DAGA Director