JOHANNES THEODORUS MARIA LUBBERS
-
About JOHANNES THEODORUS MARIA LUBBERS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U00082GA2006PTC004484 MUNDUS REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 01/03/2006 - U00313GA2002PTC003084 PLASTIC EXPORT ZUNDERT (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 13204000.0 Active 10/11/2010 - U25209GA2000PTC002820 MULTICAVITY MOULDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 25/02/2000 - U36912GA2014PTC007452 SID INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/05/2014 -