JAYESH SHAH
-
About JAYESH SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45204GJ2001PLC039169 ENERGYLINK (INDIA) LIMITED 520000000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45209GJ2013PTC074988 KALPATARU SATPURA TRANSCO PRIVATE LIMITED 161900000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U85110GJ2005PTC046960 SHARDA MEDICAL NURSING HOME AND EYE CARE PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 21/10/2005 - U85110GJ2008PTC055298 GANDHINAGAR MEDICARE PRIVATE LIMITED 10051000.0 Active 01/04/2009 - -
Associated with Directors