JAIPRAKASH JATASHANKAR JAISWAR
-
About JAIPRAKASH JATASHANKAR JAISWAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909MH2017PTC292198 HARSHUL TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 08/03/2017 - U51909MH2017PTC292257 HRIDESH MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 09/03/2017 - U51909MH2017PTC292268 MITALI MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 09/03/2017 - U51909MH2017PTC292449 PARIMAL TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 15/03/2017 - U51909MH2017PTC293663 AKHIL MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 10/04/2017 - U51909MH2017PTC293792 YUGANSH MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 12/04/2017 - U70102MH2015PTC262992 NIRMAL REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/01/2016 - U70102MH2015PTC263042 SAHAS PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/01/2016 - U70109MH2017PTC292721 SAYURI INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U70200MH2017PTC292720 ESHANIKA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
SACHIN JADHAV MADHUKAR Director