KALYAN KUMAR SHROFF
-
About KALYAN KUMAR SHROFF,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65993WB1979PLC032274 MULTICON REALTY LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 20/03/2002 - U15411WB1994PTC065818 CASUARINA CONFECTIONSERS PVT LTD 11650000.0 Active 16/04/2001 - U45200WB1991PTC052903 STAR INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY PVT LTD 9962230.0 Active 15/12/2008 - U45201WB1997PTC083364 M.G.AWASAN & ENCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 1972000.0 Amalgamated 06/09/2005 - U45201WB1997PTC083365 M G GRIHNIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 1862000.0 Amalgamated 05/09/2005 - U45201WB1997PTC083366 M. G. PROMOTER PRIVATE LIMITED 13229980.0 Active 02/09/2005 - U45201WB1997PTC083509 M G AWAS & NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 1432000.0 Amalgamated 06/09/2005 - U45400WB2011PTC168328 GOLDSMITH INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 24/01/2012 - U51311WB1992PTC054047 ROSHAN HOUSING PROJECTS PVT LTD 107000.0 Active 22/05/2000 - U51909WB1995PTC074392 HAPPY MASSCOMM PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/10/2007 - U51909WB1997PTC083363 M.G.APPARTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1882000.0 Amalgamated 05/09/2005 - U52324WB1993PTC060559 MULTICON EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 15/12/2000 - U63090WB1986PTC040477 REGENT HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 25/07/1994 - U64204WB2009PTC136083 MULTIREACH MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 22/06/2009 - U65921WB1985PTC038834 ORBIT TOWERS PVT LTD 7480670.0 Active 07/08/2000 - U65921WB1986PTC041524 CALCUTTA AMENITIES DEVELOPMENT PVT. LTD. 475000.0 Active 23/06/2017 - U66030WB1989PLC047302 MULTIMONEY FOREX LIMITED 84419000.0 Active 04/07/2011 - U70101WB1991PTC050699 MULTICON EXIM PVT. LTD. 100000.0 Active 01/07/2002 - U70101WB2004PTC099097 ESKAY TOWER PRIVATE LIMITED 1346750.0 Active 05/03/2010 - U70104WB1987PTC042108 ORCHID TOWERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 13/10/1990 - U70109WB1986PTC040947 MONTANE CONSTRUCTIONS PVT. LTD. 301000.0 Active 06/03/1993 - U74210WB1981PLC039313 MULTICON BUILDERS LIMITED 600000.0 Active 22/07/1988 - U74999WB2004PTC100782 DWARKA OWNERS' MAINTENANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 424150.0 Active 21/12/2004 - -
Associated with Directors