KAMAL KISHORE SARDA
-
About KAMAL KISHORE SARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27100MH1973PLC016617 SARDA ENERGY & MINERALS LIMITED 360492350.0 Active 01/04/2010 - L67120CT1982PLC001961 CHHATISGARH INVESTMENTS LIMITED 2580000.0 Active 19/07/2002 - U02000CT1988PTC004297 PRACHI AGRICULTURE & PROPERTIES PVT LTD 495000.0 Active 17/03/2016 - U40101CT2005PTC017635 CHHATTISGARH HYDRO POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 2104400.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 24/05/2005 - U40101UP1994PLC017151 PARVATIYA POWER LIMITED 15356500.0 Active 01/07/2004 - U40102CT2008PLC000406 SARDA ENERGY LIMITED 7163070.0 Active 22/04/2008 - U40109CT1998PLC012606 CHHATTISGARH ELECTRICITY COMPANY LIMITED 21500000.0 Amalgamated 19/07/2002 - U51420MH2008PLC187689 SARDA METALS & ALLOYS LIMITED 210160000.0 Active 21/10/2008 - U65999MH2016PLC288179 PROSPEROUS HOUSING FINANCE LIMITED 7000.0 Active 06/12/2016 - U74899DL1994PLC061349 MADHYA BHARAT POWER CORPORATION LIMITED 1623240400.0 Active 07/09/1994 - -
Associated with Directors