KASHMIRI LAL CHHABRA
-
About KASHMIRI LAL CHHABRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27106CH1985PTC006247 JSK STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 108048000.0 Active 14/12/2007 - U27107CH1996PTC018180 GOVINDA TUBES PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 15/05/1996 - U29246CH1988PTC008723 CHHABRA STEEL STRIPS PRIVATE LIMITED 1548700.0 Active 01/02/2002 - U70109WB1996PTC081510 METROPOLITAN PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 18146000.0 Active 12/01/2017 - U74999CH2009PTC031681 JSK METALEX PRIVATE LIMITED 124051600.0 Active 14/07/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
VINEET CHHABRA Director RAKESH KUMAR KUNDAN Director