KAILASH CHAND GUPTA
-
About KAILASH CHAND GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15421UP1932PLC025141 UPPER GANGES SUGAR AND INDUSTRIES LIMITED 415572390.0 Amalgamated 04/03/2017 - L51226WB1985PLC039024 SONALI COMMERCIAL LTD 2450000.0 Active 01/07/1986 - L51909WB1982PLC035425 DUKE COMMERCE LTD 9566000.0 Active 21/03/2007 - L65923WB1991PLC053077 MASTER EXCHANGE & FINANCE LIMITED 9634600.0 Active 16/04/1996 - U45400WB1995PLC098911 SIL PROPERTIES LIMITED 84090450.0 Active 20/03/2007 - U51909WB1976PTC030565 LA MONDE EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1260000.0 Amalgamated 28/04/2005 - U51909WB1982PLC035269 RICON COMMERCE LTD 2400000.0 Active 20/04/1993 - U51909WB1983PTC037043 DEEPSHIKHA TRADING CO PVT LTD 11000000.0 Active 10/06/1987 - U51909WB2005PTC105163 GLADIOLUS TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 26/05/2006 - U67120WB1985PTC038868 G M B INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 10252000.0 Active 22/06/2010 - U67120WB1986PLC041679 HARGAON INVESTMENT & TRADING CO LTD 30457270.0 Active 26/12/1986 - U70101WB2003PLC097280 HARGAON PROPERTIES LIMITED 4999990.0 Active 18/11/2003 - -
Associated with Directors