K S GREWAL
-
About K S GREWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L31300CH1983PLC005385 TELEPHONE CABLES LIMITED 98900000.0 Under Liquidation 01/08/1999 - U01119CH1993PLC013516 DASHMESH HAEGENS AGRO TECH LIMITED 46545100.0 Active 12/07/1993 - U01119PB1995PLC016564 CHAHAL MUSHROOMS LIMITED 26852300.0 Active 24/08/2006 - U40105CH1999PTC022720 SOBRA POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/06/1999 - -
Associated with Directors
JYOTI RAI Director BUBLI BRAR Director CHITWAN SINGH GREWAL Director