KARAN AGARWAL
-
About KARAN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22219MH2006PTC164906 OHM ARTS PRIVATE LIMITED 3004500.0 Active 16/04/2013 - U27100WB2008PTC123879 SARWAR STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 1737500.0 Active 01/03/2012 - U27205WB2008PTC123886 KINGSTON JEWELLERY PRIVATE LIMITED 6257500.0 Active 17/02/2010 - U45400MH2007PTC175441 RIKA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/10/2007 - U51101WB2007PLC117031 RIKA GLOBAL IMPEX LIMITED 7736450.0 Active 10/07/2007 - U51109WB2007PTC113020 UMA VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 9604650.0 Active 01/01/2009 - U51109WB2007PTC113033 NUPUR VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 9632000.0 Active 25/09/2008 - U51109WB2007PTC118438 DHANLAXMI TIEUP PRIVATE LIMITED 3232000.0 Active 10/01/2013 - U51909WB2004PTC100306 BALAJEE VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 8654100.0 Active 23/09/2008 - U61200MH2011PTC225502 RIKA SHIPPING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/12/2011 - U65990MH1994PTC081134 R. PIYARELALL FINANCE & INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 13000000.0 Active 24/02/2007 - U70102MH2008PTC187026 JEENMATA REAL ESTATE ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/09/2008 - U74120MH1977PTC019469 CHEMICON ENGINEERING CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 562700.0 Active 08/06/2002 -