KAPIL KUMAR
-
About KAPIL KUMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909DL1991PLC045249 SRG HUMAN RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT LIMITED 725700.0 Amalgamated 24/06/2009 - U65910DL1997PTC086214 SHREE KHEMI SHAKTI LEASING AND PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 01/01/2009 - U65929DL1996PTC078905 SHRI DEORAHA FINLEASE PRIVATE LIMITED 460000.0 Amalgamated 10/07/2009 - U65929DL1996PTC079025 SHRI RAM SEVAK FINVEST PRIVATE LIMITED 469860.0 Amalgamated 31/07/2009 - U67120DL1996PTC078893 SHRI DEORAHA FINVEST PRIVATE LIMITED 355000.0 Amalgamated 10/07/2009 - U67120DL1996PTC078894 SHRI RAM SEVAK FINCAP PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Amalgamated 31/07/2009 - U70101DL1996PLC075442 NEAT DEVELOPERS LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 01/08/2008 - U74899DL1988PTC030765 EXABROAD FINANCE PVT LTD 535000.0 Amalgamated 10/07/2009 - U74899DL1993PLC055782 INFOPARK (INDIA) LIMITED 10000000.0 Amalgamated 12/03/2009 - U74899DL1995PTC064511 NEWAGE SHARES AND STOCK BROKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2788500.0 Amalgamated 18/06/2009 - U74899DL1995PTC069933 PRUDAY INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Amalgamated 10/07/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
VIJAY PAL SHUKLA Director RAM KUMAR YADAV Director ASHOK AGARWAL Director ANKIT RATHI Director