KAUSHAL JAIN
-
About KAUSHAL JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U36101DL2006PTC144441 ARIHANT WOOD ART PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 23/01/2006 - U45201DL2005PTC132188 K R MAINTENANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/01/2005 - U51909DL1996PTC082908 ARIHANT BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 19112000.0 Active 25/10/1996 - U70102DL2010PTC201417 ARIHANT INFRRA REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 1300000.0 Active 12/04/2010 - U70102DL2013PTC259143 PROSPER BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/09/2015 - U70109DL2016PTC305266 ARIHANT COMSOFT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2016 - U70200DL2012PTC236634 CITYCON BUILDWEL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2014 - U72200DL2008PTC178892 SHUBHANKAR INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/10/2016 - U74904DL2002PTC117645 ROCOCO COLLECTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 4000000.0 Active 07/12/2006 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJIV JAIN Director RAJESH JAIN Director ANUPAM KUMARI Director NEELAM JAIN Director RUCHI JAIN Director