KISHAN DEO AGARWAL
-
About KISHAN DEO AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U23203WB1994PTC065419 ARYA GAS COMPANY PVT.LTD. 12210500.0 Active 09/10/1994 - U51909WB1993PTC061287 WELCON AUTO DISTRIBUTORS PVT. LTD. 1480470.0 Active 15/05/2007 - U70101WB1962PTC025564 SHIVA POLYNERS PRIVATE LIMITED. 50174200.0 Active 18/03/1995 - U70101WB1989PTC046031 KRISHAN APARTMENT CONSTRUCTION COM PVT LTD 998400.0 Active 13/12/2011 - U74120WB1975PTC030146 SHREE KRISHAN CO (MANUFACTURERS) PRIVATE LIMITED 31921800.0 Active 05/01/1986 - -
Associated with Directors
MANOJ KUMAR AGARWAL Director VISHAL AGARWAL Director AMIT GUPTA Director PANKAJ AGARWAL Director