KETAN DALPAT SHAH
-
About KETAN DALPAT SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH2006PTC159794 VEGA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 19/11/2009 - U51109MH2009PTC193875 DIYA MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 28/03/2015 - U51900MH1998PTC113036 JAHNAVI INFOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/01/1998 - U51909MH2003PTC141826 PARIPURNA MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/12/2006 - U67190MH2005PTC154879 PRIMAFACIE REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/07/2005 - -
Associated with Directors
KHILEN VYOMESH SHAH Director JAINAM NARESH SHAH Director KANAN KETAN SHAH Director