KAVITA NARESH MODI
-
About KAVITA NARESH MODI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U16000TN1980PLC008376 RELIANCE TOBACCO LTD 500000.0 Active 26/07/2004 - U51909MH1983PTC030820 RAMS RADIOGRAFIX PRIVATE LIMITED 3550000.0 Converted to LLP 14/12/2007 - U51909TN1990PTC020022 ABISHEK INTERNATIONAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 361900.0 Active 11/12/1996 - U67120MH1985PTC035696 P B MODI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 03/02/1987 - U67120MH1986PTC039459 P B MODI HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 7250000.0 Active 03/02/1995 - U70101TN1989PTC016794 RAJWANTI PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 174780.0 Active 25/01/1989 - -
Associated with Directors
NARESH PURSHOTTAM MODI Director ABHISHEK NARESH MODI Director RAMESH PURSHOTTAM MODI Director