KAMLESH SANJAY SHARMA
-
About KAMLESH SANJAY SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51101MH2011PTC218152 MARS COMMERCE COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 31/05/2017 - U63000MH2006PTC158795 MARS MOVERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/01/2006 - U63000MH2008PTC181149 MARS WAREHOUSE & LOGISTICS CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/04/2008 - U64202MH2006PTC158837 AYESAN TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/01/2006 - U70102MH2006PTC164069 MARS CREATORS AND REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/06/2011 - U72900MH2005PTC155750 MARS SYNERGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/08/2005 - U80904MH2012PTC234638 COFFEE BEAN LEARNING SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
SANJAY ROSHANLAL SHARMA Director ASHOK HARIRAM MEWANI Director VARSHA AGRAWAL VINAYKUMAR Director