KUNAL BANKA
-
About KUNAL BANKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U31300WB1989PTC047180 SHARDA MERCANDISE PVT LTD 1492000.0 Active 24/03/2009 - U51502WB1996PTC082260 LIBRA EQUIPMENTS & MACHINERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 4847000.0 Active 08/12/2011 - U51909WB1997PTC084619 NCI CABLE PRIVATE LIMITED 4988000.0 Active 24/03/2009 - U51909WB2011PTC163375 MANGALNIDHI COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2011 - U51909WB2011PTC163392 PASHUPATI VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2011 - U51909WB2011PTC163402 TRIBHUWAN SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2011 - U51909WB2011PTC163413 SAPTRISHI DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2011 - U70100WB2007PTC120822 PRATEEK NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 05/02/2008 - U70100WB2007PTC120824 SURYAKIRAN NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 05/02/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
KHUSHBOO BAGARIA Director SAURABH SARDA Director AMITA BANKA Director RAJESH KUMAR BANKA Director