KANAK KUMAR OSWAL
-
About KANAK KUMAR OSWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2010PTC153482 MOONDHARA VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 632500.0 Active 01/12/2012 - U51909WB2010PTC153899 PUSHPANJALI DEALTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 794500.0 Active 01/12/2012 - U51909WB2011PTC164645 GANESHVANI COMMODITIES MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED 781000.0 Active 30/11/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC175010 AVLOKAN TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 992500.0 Active 30/11/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC175231 VRIHAD VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 999000.0 Active 30/11/2012 - U52190WB2009PTC137932 UMAPUTRA VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 644000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U52393WB2010PTC151730 KADAMBARI JEWELLERS PRIVATE LIMITED 796000.0 Active 12/12/2012 - U70109WB2012PTC174213 MANGALBELA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 818500.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U70109WB2012PTC174826 DIGANTA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 791000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U70109WB2012PTC174839 WALTAZ INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 612500.0 Active 31/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
SURENDRA KUMAR JAIN Director SARWAN KUMAR BOTHRA Director