KUSUM AGARWAL
-
About KUSUM AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2007PTC115248 SURAJ BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 13545000.0 Active 05/08/2011 - U51109WB1998PTC086380 LANDSCAPE BUSINESS PVT. LTD. 13785080.0 Active 01/12/2017 - U51909WB1993PTC057701 TULSA MERCANTILE PVT LTD 5903500.0 Active 23/03/2009 - U74900WB2009PTC134406 RISHI PAVERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 30/03/2009 - -
Associated with Directors
ASHOK KUMAR AGARWAL Director SUBHASH GARG Director SANDIP AGARWAL Director SURESH KUMAR AGARWAL Director