KANTILAL GULABRAI AGARWAL
-
About KANTILAL GULABRAI AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18109TG2010PTC070169 VIJAYRAM SPINTEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/08/2010 - U22300TG2017PTC114137 MAHAVIR FLEXO PACKAGING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/01/2017 - U27109AP2004PTC042703 VENKATA BALAJI STEEL ROLLING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 20/02/2004 - U27109TG1993PTC015482 MAHAVIR ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 28/09/2002 - U27310TG1982PTC003541 SRI SHIVA SPINNING MILLS PVT LTD 20000000.0 Active 24/06/1982 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMPRASAD KANTILAL AGARWAL Director RAMRATAN AGARWAL Director