KARAN DAVINDER CHOPRA
-
About KARAN DAVINDER CHOPRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29307GA2010PTC006438 RAY FORCE GREENTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/12/2015 - U70101MH2006PTC166518 VAIDEHI AKASH REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2016 - U70109DL2010PTC198906 TRIUMPH SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/10/2014 - U92100MH2008PTC178265 ADAI MEHRA PRODUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/05/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
DEEPAK SOLANKI Director SUSHIL GORAKH SHINDE Director RASHI AMIT MEHRA Director AMIT PRAKASH MEHRA Director