KARTHIK SUNDER RAJU
-
About KARTHIK SUNDER RAJU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101KA1999PLC026081 ATRIA POWER (KRS) LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U51109WB2008PTC123265 VAISHNOMATA COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3550000.0 Active 18/09/2010 - U55100KA1995PTC018477 CHALUKYA HOLIDAY RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 198999900.0 Active 16/04/2012 - U55101KA1994PTC015562 CHALUKYA HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/04/2017 - U60221WB1997PTC085748 ESTEE CARRIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 8504500.0 Active 26/09/2011 - U65993WB1992PTC054292 ESKAY MERCANTILE COMMERCIAL & HOLDING PVT LTD. 24521500.0 Active 02/05/2017 - U70101WB1990PTC049873 GULMOHAR PROMOTERS PVT LTD 6216000.0 Active 02/05/2017 - U74995KA1984PTC005975 VISWESWARAIAH TECHNICAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 2307100.0 Active 25/04/2017 - U80903KA2014PTC073165 HED EXPERTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
KAUSHIK SUNDER RAJU Director THEJAVATHI SUNDER RAJU Director BHARATHI NAGARAJU Director INDIRAMMA Director