KARTIK TELTIA
-
About KARTIK TELTIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909DL2008PTC184420 PIONEER GLOBAL ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2013 - U74900DL2013PTC255455 SOLARWORLD ENERGY SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 17/07/2013 - U74999DL2016PTC302099 AVANT ADVANCED ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 10000.0 Active 24/06/2016 - U74999UP2017PTC091394 KEHAN SOLARWORLD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
SUSHIL KUMAR JAIN Director RISHABH JAIN Director PRANAY SHANKER GARG Director PRIYANK SHANKER GARG Director