KRISHNA SHANTARAM DALVI
-
About KRISHNA SHANTARAM DALVI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122MH2011PLC221355 TWENTYONE SUGARS LIMITED 11568500.0 Active 11/04/2016 - U45202MH1994PTC081722 SAIDA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/02/2016 - U55101MH2002PTC135554 VYANJAN HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/01/2015 - U65923MH2007PTC167496 TRIO ASSETS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/01/2015 - U74995MH2018PTC305179 TWENTYONE MATERIALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2018 - -
Associated with Directors
KAUSHAL CHANDRAKANT PAURANA Director SHAILESH DATTARAM SAWANT Director HANUMANT SOMNATH DHENGLE Director