KRIPASHANKAR RAMPRASHAD KAHAR
-
About KRIPASHANKAR RAMPRASHAD KAHAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109MH2008PTC188332 OWN MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 02/07/2014 - U51109MH2008PTC188444 EARNEST MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 1975000.0 Active 23/09/2014 - U51900MH2015PTC262626 SARTH MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 11/03/2015 - U70102MH2010PTC203471 SHADOW PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - U70109MH2010PTC199949 MANGALAYA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
HARDIK MAHESH KUMAR ANADA Director TEJAL KONDLEKAR Director MANISH KUMAR SINGH Director