KALIKA PRASAD SHUKLA
-
About KALIKA PRASAD SHUKLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200WB2017PLC220071 SARAMVI REALCON LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/03/2017 - U45309WB2016PTC215554 NAVITA NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/04/2016 - U45309WB2017PLC219809 SHUBHAPRADA REALCON LIMITED 500000.0 Active 07/03/2017 - U45400WB2013PTC194018 NAVRATRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/02/2017 - U45400WB2016PTC209790 SARAMVI CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2016 - U45400WB2017PLC219865 SHUCHI DEVCON LIMITED 500000.0 Active 09/03/2017 - U45500WB2017PLC219811 TUSHTI CONSTRUCTION LIMITED 500000.0 Active 07/03/2017 - U51109WB2005PTC102258 MANDIR VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 156000.0 Active 15/02/2017 - U51109WB2007PTC121112 DHANTERASH STEEL TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5604000.0 Active 12/05/2016 - U51909WB2013PTC196908 GOPESH VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 2307000.0 Active 17/02/2017 - U51909WB2017PLC219771 DEVHA TRADEX LIMITED 500000.0 Active 06/03/2017 - U51909WB2017PLC219856 NAVITA SALES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 09/03/2017 - U51909WB2017PLC219895 SARAMVI SALES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 10/03/2017 - U51909WB2017PLC220016 SALPUTRI TRADEX LIMITED 500000.0 Active 16/03/2017 - U51909WB2017PLC220031 NAVITA VINTRADE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/03/2017 - U51909WB2017PLC220085 SUBHLIFE DISTRIBUTORS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 20/03/2017 - U52100WB2010PTC148177 PADMINI BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 392000.0 Active 16/02/2017 - -
Associated with Directors