LALIT BHASIN
-
About LALIT BHASIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45203UP2007PLC033119 JAYPEE INFRATECH LIMITED 13889334970.0 Active 09/02/2015 - L55101DL1979PLC009498 CHL LIMITED 109637000.0 Active 27/01/2011 - L65910HR1982PLC034071 HB LEASING AND FINANCE COMPANY LIMITED 110627310.0 Active 29/06/1990 - L65929HR1985PLC033936 HB STOCK HOLDINGS LIMITED 237922180.0 Active 16/08/1989 - L67120HR1994PLC034148 HB PORTFOLIO LIMITED 119923290.0 Active 27/07/2004 - L99999HR1994PLC034146 HB ESTATE DEVELOPERS LIMITED 961382870.0 Active 20/09/1994 - U36911DL2010PTC206372 ALMR GEMS & TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 28/07/2010 - U67190MH1993PLC073154 TAURUS ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED 169312360.0 Active 20/03/1999 - U74899DL1980PTC010249 H B FINANCIAL CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 10500000.0 Active 26/08/2004 - U74899DL1981PTC011517 PAL PROPERTIES (INDIA) PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 21/04/1997 - U74899DL1982PTC014344 HBB PROPERTIES PVT LTD 120200.0 Active 26/08/2004 - U74899DL1993PLC055382 R R B MASTER SECURITIES DELHI LTD 55007000.0 Active 27/09/1993 - U74899DL1994PTC058050 R.R.B. HOUSE FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 24/03/1994 - -
Associated with Directors