LALIT AGARWAL
-
About LALIT AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74899DL1993PLC055470 NIMBUS PROJECTS LIMITED 274380000.0 Active 19/07/2011 - U65903DL1995PLC065449 NIMBUS MULTICOMMODITY BROKERS LIMITED 6400000.0 Active 15/07/2011 - U70101DL1995PTC073884 NIMBUS PROPMART PRIVATE LIMITED 77957000.0 Active 05/02/2016 - U74899DL1994PLC063472 NIMBUS INDIA LIMITED 115250000.0 Active 16/07/2011 - U74899DL1995PTC064666 ALLIED FINANCIAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 22500000.0 Active 07/06/2002 - -
Associated with Directors