LAKSHMI NIWAS BANGUR
-
About LAKSHMI NIWAS BANGUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51909WB1995PLC071730 KIRAN VYAPAR LTD. 259200000.0 Active 10/09/2013 - L70109WB1948PLC016546 AMALGAMATED DEVELOPMENT LTD 1750000.0 Active 18/12/2006 - U01400WB2013PTC193274 SIDHYAYI GREENVIEW PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/05/2013 - U01400WB2013PTC193275 PURNAY GREENFIELD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/05/2013 - U17100MH1935PTC002248 THE MARWAR TEXTILES (AGENCY) PRIVATE LIMITED 800000.0 Active 11/01/1990 - U40300WB2012PTC188041 LNB SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 16/03/2015 - U51102RJ1939PLC000063 SHREE KRISHNA AGENCY LIMITED 109496000.0 Active 09/10/1989 - U65921WB1984PLC038223 SRI VITHOBA INVESTMENTS LTD 14340000.0 Amalgamated 08/11/2001 - U65993WB1978PLC090188 DIGVIJAY INVESTMENTS LIMITED 192011200.0 Amalgamated 10/06/1989 - U70102WB2013PTC191027 LNB REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/02/2013 - U74140WB1946PLC014233 PLACID LIMITED 51023400.0 Active 02/09/1992 - U85190WB1991PTC051096 APURVA EXPORT PVT LTD 2550000.0 Active 19/07/2001 - U91990WB1981NPL034170 MUGNEERAM RAMCOOWAR BANGUR CHARITABLE & RELIGIOUS COMPANY 0.0 Active 01/09/1993 - -
Associated with Directors